NV AB442 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-13 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-13 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxation; authorizing certain employers to receive a credit against the payroll taxes imposed on the employer if the employer pays all or part of the cost for an employee to receive academic or vocational instruction; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to the modified business tax. (BDR 32-1125)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-13 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/80th2019/Bill/6855/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/80th2019/Bills/AB/AB442.pdf |