NV AB441 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 391.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 391.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to legislators; authorizing the allocation of the legislative measures requested by a legislator whose office becomes vacant during a certain period; revising provisions governing the purposes for which a Legislator may use unspent campaign contributions; authorizing a legislator who is appointed to the office of a legislator under certain circumstances to solicit or accept monetary contributions during certain periods; restricting the expenses for which such contributions may be used; requiring such contributions that remain unspent after a certain period to be returned or donated for certain purposes; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing legislators. (BDR 17-922)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 391. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 825 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | To Assembly. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | To printer. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.) |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 825.) |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 31, Nays: 11.) To Senate. |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Exempt pursuant to subsection 4 of Joint Standing Rule 14.6. |
2021-03-30 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-29 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |