NV AB429 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to motor vehicles; establishing provisions governing the licensing and operation of a peer-to-peer car sharing program; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Establishes provisions governing peer-to-peer car sharing programs. (BDR 43-861)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 380.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-03-29 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer. |