NV AB427 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing eligibility of certain convicted persons for public assistance. (BDR 38-1054)
Title
Revises provisions governing eligibility of certain convicted persons for public assistance. (BDR 38-1054)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Bill read. Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Returned to Assembly with Governor's veto message. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2017-05-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 755 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) To Assembly. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 755.) To printer. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 32, Nays: 10.) To Senate. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-21 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |