NV AB403 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions concerning peace officers. (BDR 23-813)
Title
Revises provisions concerning peace officers. (BDR 23-813)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | To committee. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | Exemption effective. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2015-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2015-03-20 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-17 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |