NV AB393 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 389.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 389.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to criminal justice; requiring the Executive Director of the Department of Sentencing Policy to assist the Nevada Sentencing Commission in carrying out certain duties; revising provisions relating to certain reports prepared by the Commission; authorizing the Commission to adopt qualifications for members of the Nevada Local Justice Reinvestment Coordinating Council; revising provisions concerning reports of presentence investigations; revising provisions relating to parolees and probationers; removing and replacing certain obsolete terminology; revising provisions concerning the embezzlement of a vehicle and certain marijuana-related offenses; authorizing the Attorney General to investigate and prosecute any criminal offense committed by a city officer or employee in certain circumstances; repealing provisions relating to inquiries to determine probable cause when a probationer is in custody for a violation of a condition of probation; repealing provisions requiring the Chief Parole and Probation Officer of the Division of Parole and Probation of the Department of Public Safety to adopt standards to assist in formulating a recommendation concerning the granting of probation or the revocation of parole or probation; providing penalties; making an appropriation; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes various changes relating to criminal justice. (BDR 14-484)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 389. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Senate Amendment Nos. 775 and 851 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Fourth reprint. To Assembly. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | To printer. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 851.) |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. To committee. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 775.) |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Not voting: 1.) To Senate. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 673.) To printer. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | To committee. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 146.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Taken from Second Reading File. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-02 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |