NV AB383 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 368.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 368.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to energy; requiring the Director of the Office of Energy to adopt standards of energy efficiency for certain appliances; prohibiting the sale, lease, rental or installation of certain new appliances that are not in compliance with energy efficiency standards; authorizing the Director to adopt standards of energy efficiency for certain additional appliances; requiring the Director to adopt regulations establishing a procedure for a consumer to apply for a delay in the implementation of a standard of energy efficiency for certain appliances; requiring a manufacturer to submit a certification for certain appliances prior to sale; authorizing the Director to take certain actions to investigate possible violations; establishing a civil penalty for violations; authorizing the adoption of appliance standards to facilitate the implementation of flexible demand technology; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Establishes provisions governing the energy efficiency of certain appliances. (BDR 58-490)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 368. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 13, Excused: 3.) To printer. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 794.) |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | To committee. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 430.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Action of rereferral rescinded. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 399.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer. |