NV AB337 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 308.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 308.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing campaign practices. (BDR 24-721)
Title
Revises provisions governing campaign practices. (BDR 24-721)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-10 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 308. | |
2011-06-04 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-06-02 | Senate Amendment No. 689 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2011-05-31 | In Assembly. | |
2011-05-30 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 10.) To Assembly. | |
2011-05-30 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . | |
2011-05-29 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 689.) To printer. | |
2011-05-29 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-05-29 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-04-27 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. | |
2011-04-27 | In Senate. | |
2011-04-26 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2011-04-26 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-25 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 167.) To printer. | |
2011-04-25 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-04-25 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-03-23 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-03-21 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |