NV AB330 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to certain systems for the generation of electricity. (BDR 58-934)
Title
Revises provisions relating to certain systems for the generation of electricity. (BDR 58-934)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.) |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | To printer. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 610.) |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 520.) To printer. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-03-18 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |