NV AB323 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state administration; revising the requirements concerning the statement of fiscal effect of each bill or joint resolution; directing the Legislative Commission to appoint a committee to conduct an interim study concerning increases in the salary and benefits of state employees; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing state administration. (BDR 17-49)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Exempt pursuant to subsection 4 of Joint Standing Rule 14.6. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/80th2019/Bill/6587/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/80th2019/Bills/AB/AB323.pdf |