NV AB322 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to cannabis; providing for the licensure and regulation by the Cannabis Compliance Board of certain events at which the sale and consumption of cannabis or cannabis products is allowed; setting forth certain requirements for the issuance of a cannabis event organizer license, temporary cannabis event permit and portable cannabis vendor license; setting forth certain requirements concerning the operation of a temporary cannabis event; imposing various requirements on cannabis event organizers and portable cannabis vendors; requiring the Board to take certain actions concerning applicants for certain licenses who are social equity applicants; requiring the Board to adopt regulations establishing certain fees; revising provisions relating to the consumption of cannabis in a public place; revising provisions relating to the excise tax on retail sales of cannabis and cannabis products; exempting the holder of a cannabis event organizer license from certain provisions prohibiting a person from maintaining a place for the purpose of unlawfully selling, giving away or using any controlled substance; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Provides for the licensure and regulation of certain events at which the sale and consumption of cannabis or cannabis products is allowed. (BDR 56-789)
Sponsors
Rep. Cameron Miller [D] | Rep. Cecelia Gonzalez [D] | Sen. Edgar Flores [D] | Rep. Brittney Miller [D] |
Rep. Daniele Monroe-Moreno [D] | Rep. Clara Thomas [D] | Rep. Selena Torres [D] | Sen. Dallas Harris [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 395.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-02 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To printer. |