NV AB303 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 429.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public health; prohibiting the sale of certain kratom products to a minor; prohibiting the preparation, distribution, advertising or sale of certain adulterated kratom products; prohibiting the sale of a kratom product that does not have a label that contains certain information; providing civil penalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to kratom products. (BDR 52-1055)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 429.
2019-06-01AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-28AssemblySenate Amendment No. 800 concurred in. To enrollment.
2019-05-27AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-05-24SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2019-05-24SenateTaken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
2019-05-21SenateTaken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
2019-05-21SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
2019-05-20SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 800.) To printer.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time.
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-24SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2019-04-24SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 29, Nays: 12, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 611.) To printer.
2019-04-22AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-19AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-18AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback