NV AB303 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-11 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-11 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing academic standards in public schools. (BDR 34-886)
Title
Revises provisions governing academic standards in public schools. (BDR 34-886)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-11 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-13 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |