NV AB302 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 205.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 205.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to legislative measures; authorizing the Nevada Commission on Minority Affairs to request the drafting of not more than 2 legislative measures for each regular session of the Legislature; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Authorizes the Nevada Commission on Minority Affairs to request the drafting of not more than 2 legislative measures for each regular session of the Legislature. (BDR 17-990)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-29 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 205. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 7.) To Senate. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2021-04-09 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. |
2021-04-09 | Assembly | Taken from Second Reading File. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |