NV AB299 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to wildlife; providing for the issuance of a salvage permit to certain persons for the salvage and possession of certain animals hit and killed by a motor vehicle; imposing certain requirements on a holder of a salvage permit; authorizing a peace officer to make certain inspections; prohibiting a person from selling, bartering or exchanging the carcass of such an animal; providing that a peace officer, agency employing a peace officer and the Department of Wildlife are not liable with respect to any use made of the carcass of such an animal; prohibiting the salvaging and taking possession of such animals from certain areas in this State; providing penalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes various changes relating to wildlife. (BDR 45-733)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | To committee. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 236.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-29 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer. |