NV AB285 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Chapter 149.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Chapter 149.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; removing certain requirements for the use of restorative disciplinary practices in public schools; requiring certain schools to provide a progressive discipline plan based on restorative justice to certain pupils; revising provisions governing the development of a plan of discipline by the board of trustees of a school district or governing body of a charter school or university school for profoundly gifted pupils; revising provisions governing age and certain other requirements for the suspension, expulsion and permanent expulsion of pupils; requiring the provision and reporting of a plan to provide education services to certain pupils; revising provisions governing the reporting of certain data concerning discipline of pupils; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing school safety and student behavior. (BDR 34-638)
Sponsors
Rep. Angie Taylor [D] | Rep. Selena Torres [D] | Rep. Natha Anderson [D] | Rep. Shannon Bilbray-Axelrod [D] |
Rep. Alexis Hansen [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Chapter 149. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Senate Amendment Nos. 701 and 821 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. To Assembly. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | To printer. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 821.) |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Waiver granted effective: May 26, 2023. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 701.) To printer. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 4.) To Senate. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 374.) To printer. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-14 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |