NV AB273 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT making an appropriation to the Elko County School District for the construction of a school to replace an existing school; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes an appropriation to the Elko County School District for the construction of a school to replace an existing school. (BDR S-201)
Sponsors
Rep. Alexis Hansen [R] | Sen. Ira Hansen [R] | Rep. Natha Anderson [D] | Rep. Jill Dickman [R] |
Rep. Heidi Kasama [R] | Rep. Angie Taylor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2023-04-03 | Assembly | Notice of exemption. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-08 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/82nd2023/Bill/10053/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/82nd2023/Bills/AB/AB273.pdf |