NV AB269 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on May 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-20 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on May 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-20 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; revising provisions governing performance evaluations of certain postprobationary teachers; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing education. (BDR 34-123)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-20 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.) |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 4.) To Senate. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 373.) To printer. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-08 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |