NV AB240 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-10 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-10 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to mining; dissolving the Commission on Mineral Resources, the Division of Minerals of the Commission on Mineral Resources and the Mining Oversight and Accountability Commission; transferring the duties of the Commission on Mineral Resources to the State Environmental Commission; transferring the duties of the Division of Minerals to the Division of Environmental Protection of the State Department of Conservation and Natural Resources; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing mining. (BDR 46-936)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-10 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-03-12 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/81st2021/Bill/7692/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/AB/AB240.pdf |