NV AB225 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 405.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 405.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; requiring the Commission on Professional Standards in Education to consider alternative means of demonstrating competency for certain persons when adopting regulations governing examinations for the licensure of teachers and other educational personnel; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing examinations for the licensure of teachers and other educational personnel. (BDR 34-139)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 405. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass, as amended. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | To printer. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 200.) |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-12 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |