NV AB2 | 2020 | 32nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 2.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the Legislative Department of the State Government; enacting provisions governing the use by certain committees of remote-technology systems for conducting committee meetings during the public-health crisis caused by the COVID-19 pandemic; providing for the publication of certain joint resolutions proposing amendments to the Nevada Constitution under certain circumstances; revising and clarifying provisions governing the organization, operation and personnel of the Legislative Counsel Bureau; providing penalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises and clarifies provisions relating to the Legislative Department of the State Government. (BDR 17-17)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-02AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 2.
2020-08-02AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2020-08-02AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2020-08-02SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 15, Nays: 6.) To Assembly.
2020-08-01SenateRead second time.
2020-07-31SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2020-07-31SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee of the Whole. To committee.
2020-07-31SenateIn Senate.
2020-07-31AssemblyTo Senate.
2020-07-31AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2020-07-31AssemblyTo printer.
2020-07-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 1, Excused: 1.)
2020-07-31AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1.) Dispensed with reprinting.
2020-07-31AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2020-07-31AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2020-07-31AssemblyRead first time. To committee.
2020-07-31AssemblyFrom printer.
2020-07-30AssemblyTo printer.
2020-07-30AssemblyReferred to Committee of the Whole.
2020-07-30AssemblyPrefiled.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback