NV AB190 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 132.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 132.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to construction; revising the requirements pursuant to which a contractor or subcontractor engaged on a public work may discharge his or her obligation to pay prevailing wages to workers; revising provisions relating to the determination of the prevailing wages by the Labor Commissioner and the duration of such rates on a public work; prohibiting a public body from using a reverse auction when awarding a contract for public work; clarifying the application of prevailing wage requirements to certain construction projects that are not public works; eliminating certain prohibitions relating to agreements with labor organizations concerning contracts with a public body for a public work or with an awardee of certain grants, tax abatements, tax credits or tax exemptions from a public body; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to certain construction. (BDR 28-637)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 132. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 8, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 29, Nays: 12, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 233.) To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |