NV AB164 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 210.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 210.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to access by patients to certain investigational drugs, biological products and devices. (BDR 40-125)
Title
Revises provisions relating to access by patients to certain investigational drugs, biological products and devices. (BDR 40-125)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-27 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 210. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | To enrollment. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 336.) To printer. |
2015-04-10 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 216.) To printer. |
2015-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2015-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |