NV AB161 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 252.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 252.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to governmental administration; requiring, under certain circumstances, that the Department of Motor Vehicles place a designation on a vehicle registration, driver's license or identification card for a person with a communication need; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing the identification of persons. (BDR 43-635)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 252. |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2023-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Read second time. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 802.) To printer. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-14 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2023-04-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 14.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2023-04-13 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer. |