NV AB157 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to human trafficking; requiring the Department of Health and Human Services to develop a statewide plan for delivery of services to victims of human trafficking; requiring the Department of Education and the State Board of Education to develop and distribute certain informational materials relating to the human trafficking of children; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Establishes provisions relating to certain services for and resources concerning victims of human trafficking. (BDR 18-141)
Sponsors
Rep. John Hambrick [R] | Rep. Jill Tolles [R] | Rep. John Ellison [R] | Sen. Lisa Krasner [R] |
Sen. Keith Pickard [R] | Rep. Christopher Edwards [R] | Rep. Al Kramer [R] | Rep. Jim Wheeler [R] |
Sen. David Parks [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass, as amended. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | To committee. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 72.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |