NV AB151 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to offenses; revising provisions relating to the collection of delinquent fines, administrative assessments, fees and restitution; revising provisions relating to the suspension of the driver's license of a person under certain circumstances; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to offenses. (BDR 14-776)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 84.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2021-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-02 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |