NV AB130 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 253. (Effective July 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 253. (Effective July 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to assisted living; revising provisions governing the program to award competitive grants from the Fund for a Healthy Nevada to certain assisted living facilities; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to assisted living facilities. (BDR 40-694)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 253. (Effective July 1, 2023) |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2023-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Read second time. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 808.) To printer. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | Notice of exemption. |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |