NV AB125 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 261. (Effective July 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 261. (Effective July 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public safety; requiring the tribal liaison for the Department of Public Safety to maintain ongoing communication relating to missing or murdered indigenous persons between the Department and certain entities; authorizing the Department to accept a report relating to certain persons missing from an Indian reservation or Indian colony located in whole or in part in this State; requiring certain law enforcement agencies to notify certain persons or agencies after receiving a report related to a missing indigenous person; making an appropriation; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to public safety. (BDR 43-796)
Sponsors
Rep. Shea Backus [D] | Rep. Michelle Gorelow [D] | Rep. Gregory Hafen [R] | Sen. Carrie Buck [R] |
Sen. Lisa Krasner [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 261. (Effective July 1, 2023) |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | Read second time. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-06-03 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2023-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 898.) To printer. |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 258.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |