NV AB124 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-10 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to employment; prohibiting employers from discriminating against employees on the basis of sex by taking certain actions relating to the employment opportunities of an employee; prohibiting an employer from seeking or taking certain other actions relating to the wage rate history of a prospective employee; requiring an employer to disclose the minimum wage rate, wage scale or salary range for a position of employment under certain circumstances; providing remedies and administrative penalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to employment. (BDR 53-169)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-10Assembly(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
2021-03-08AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2021-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2021-02-15AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback