NM SM91 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-12 - [LD 17] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-12 - [LD 17] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Kinteel residential campus in aztec
Title
Kinteel residential campus in aztec
Sponsors
Sen. John Pinto [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | [LD 17] Signed by one or both houses |
2014-02-12 | House | [LD 17] |
2014-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Passed Senate (43-0) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Tabled temporarily by motion |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Not Referred to Committee |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Not Printed |