NM SM8 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 20] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 20] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Study School Suicides & Gun Violence
Title
Study School Suicides & Gun Violence
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | [LD 20] Signed by one or both houses |
2018-02-14 | Senate | [LD 20] Passed Senate (25-11) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-05 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Education |
2018-02-05 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-22 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Rules |
2018-01-22 | Senate | [LD 5] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Education |
2018-01-16 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |