NM SM40 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-12 - [LD 17] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-12 - [LD 17] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create nm poet laureate
Title
Create nm poet laureate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | [LD 17] Signed by one or both houses |
2014-02-12 | House | [LD 17] |
2014-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Passed Senate (35-0) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Indian & Cultural Affairs |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Rules |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Indian & Cultural Affairs |