NM SM13 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - [LD 18] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - [LD 18] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
50th Anniversary Balloon Fiesta Stamp
Title
50th Anniversary Balloon Fiesta Stamp
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | [LD 18] Signed by one or both houses |
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 17] Passed Senate (25-0) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | [LD 14] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-03 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Indian & Cultural Affairs |
2018-02-03 | Senate | [LD 11] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2018-01-22 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Rules |
2018-01-22 | Senate | [LD 5] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Indian & Cultural Affairs |
2018-01-16 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |