NM SJR16 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 7 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-07 - [LD 14] Signed Constitutional amendment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 7 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-07 - [LD 14] Signed Constitutional amendment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Judicial retention election dates, ca
Title
Judicial retention election dates, ca
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-07 | Senate | [LD 14] Signed Constitutional amendment. |
2014-02-07 | House | [LD 14] Passed House (66-0) |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Referred to House Voters & Elections |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Passed Senate (42-0) |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-29 | Senate | [LD 7] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-01-29 | Senate | [LD 7] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Rules |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Judiciary |