NM SB82 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 52 - Mar. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 52 - Mar. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Safe Harbor For Nurses Act
Title
Safe Harbor For Nurses Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 52 - Mar. 14 |
2019-03-09 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:61 N:0 |
2019-03-08 | House | HLVMC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-05 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to: HHHC/HLVMC |
2019-02-14 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HJC |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:40 N:0 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-01-25 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SJC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |