NM SB75 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-18 - [LD 33] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-18 - [LD 33] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Deferred Compensation Changes
Title
Deferred Compensation Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-18 | Senate | [LD 33] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 20 |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Passed House (66-0) |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] HLELC |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] HLELC and then to House Judiciary |
2017-01-29 | Senate | [LD 13] Passed Senate (38-0) |
2017-01-29 | Senate | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-23 | Senate | [LD 7] Referred to Senate Finance |
2017-01-23 | Senate | [LD 7] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Finance |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |