NM SB61 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - [LD 10] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - [LD 10] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
City ordinance violation civil remedies
Title
City ordinance violation civil remedies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Action postponed indefinitely |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] WITHOUT RECOMMENDATION committee report adopted and then to a |
2014-01-27 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-01-27 | Senate | [LD 5] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-27 | Senate | [LD 5] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-24 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2014-01-24 | Senate | [LD 4] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |
2014-01-21 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |