NM SB51 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-28 - [LD 12] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 70
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-28 - [LD 12] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 70
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Off-road Vehicle Licenses & Plates
Title
Off-road Vehicle Licenses & Plates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-28 | Senate | [LD 12] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 70 |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Passed House (59-0) |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Referred to House Transportation & Public Works |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Assigned to House Transportation & Public Works and then to House Appropriations & Finance |
2017-01-25 | Senate | [LD 9] Passed Senate (36-0) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | [LD 9] Floor amendment adopted |
2017-01-24 | Senate | [LD 8] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-23 | Senate | [LD 7] Referred to Senate Finance |
2017-01-23 | Senate | [LD 7] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |