NM SB51 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 52] Passed House (65-0) Signed by one or both houses (Mar.29) Ch. 66.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 52] Passed House (65-0) Signed by one or both houses (Mar.29) Ch. 66.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protective & undercover license plates
Title
Protective & undercover license plates
Sponsors
Sen. Sander Rue [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-15 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 52] Passed House (65-0) Signed by one or both houses (Mar.29) Ch. 66. |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 51] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-25 | House | [LD 30] Referred to House Transportation & Public Works |
2013-02-25 | House | [LD 30] Assigned to House Transportation & Public Works and then to House Judiciary |
2013-02-12 | Senate | [LD 21] Passed Senate (23-15) |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-01-17 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-01-17 | Senate | [LD 3] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-15 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2013-01-15 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Judiciary |
2013-01-15 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |