NM SB47 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 8 - Mar. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 8 - Mar. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Driver’s License Suspension Penalties
Title
Driver’s License Suspension Penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 8 - Mar. 15 |
2023-03-11 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:50 N:12 |
2023-03-01 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-02-25 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-02-15 | House | Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC/HTRC |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:33 N:1 |
2023-02-03 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-01-26 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC/SFC |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |