NM SB4 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-08 - [LD 39] Passed House (64-0) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-08 - [LD 39] Passed House (64-0) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Dialysis facility gross receipts
Title
Dialysis facility gross receipts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-10 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Passed House (64-0) Vetoed by the Governor and date. |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-25 | House | [LD 30] Referred to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs |
2013-02-25 | House | [LD 30] Assigned to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs and then to House Taxation & Revenue |
2013-02-12 | Senate | [LD 21] Passed Senate (30-8) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | [LD 21] Floor amendment adopted |
2013-02-08 | Senate | [LD 19] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-01-18 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Finance |
2013-01-18 | Senate | [LD 4] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-15 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2013-01-15 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |
2013-01-15 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |