NM SB398 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 256 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Dyslexic Student Early Interventions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dyslexic Student Early Interventions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateSigned by Governor - Chapter 256 - Apr. 4
2019-03-14SenateSenate has concurred with House Amendments
2019-03-13HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:48 N:15
2019-03-09HouseHEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-03-06HouseSent to HEC - Referrals: HEC
2019-03-04SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:33 N:0
2019-03-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment
2019-02-27SenateSEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-02-22SenateSPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-01-29SenateSent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SEC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback