NM SB394 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-16 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 268 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-16 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 268 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pharmacy Audit Changes & Exceptions
Title
Pharmacy Audit Changes & Exceptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 268 - Apr. 4 |
2019-03-16 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:61 N:0 |
2019-03-09 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-06 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:36 N:0 |
2019-03-02 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Sent to SCORC - Referrals: SCORC/SJC |