NM SB252 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-17 - [LD 20] Passed House (65-0) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on February 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-17 - [LD 20] Passed House (65-0) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Racing commission hearing procedure
Title
Racing commission hearing procedure
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Papen [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-17 | House | [LD 20] Passed House (65-0) Vetoed by the Governor and date. |
2014-02-07 | House | [LD 14] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-07 | House | [LD 14] Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] Passed Senate (41-0) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Finance |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-24 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-01-24 | Senate | [LD 4] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2014-01-24 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2014-01-24 | Senate | [LD 4] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2014-01-24 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2014-01-24 | Senate | [LD 4] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance |