NM SB232 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Dept. Of Transportation Expenditures

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dept. Of Transportation Expenditures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20SenateVetoed by Governor
2020-02-20SenateSenate has concurred with House Amendments
2020-02-20HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:68 N:0
2020-02-19HouseHTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2020-02-18HouseSent to HTRC - Referrals: HTRC
2020-02-18SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:41 N:0
2020-02-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment
2020-02-18SenateSFC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
2020-02-03SenateSCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session
2020-01-31SenateSent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SFC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback