NM SB218 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - [LD 41] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - [LD 41] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Free parking for certain veterans
Title
Free parking for certain veterans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | House | [LD 41] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-17 | House | [LD 41] Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-03-17 | House | [LD 41] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-03-05 | House | [LD 33] Referred to House Regulatory & Public Affairs |
2015-03-05 | House | [LD 33] Assigned to House Regulatory & Public Affairs and then to House Judiciary |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Passed Senate (41-0) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Floor amendment adopted |
2015-02-25 | Senate | [LD 27] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-30 | Senate | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-01-30 | Senate | [LD 9] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |