NM SB172 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 52] Passed House (62-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 52] Passed House (62-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Signed language practices board
Title
Signed language practices board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-15 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 52] Passed House (62-0) Pocket veto by the Governor. |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 50] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-13 | House | [LD 22] Referred to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs |
2013-02-13 | House | [LD 22] Assigned to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs and then to House Consumer & Public Affairs |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Passed Senate (33-0) |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-24 | Senate | [LD 8] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-01-24 | Senate | [LD 8] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-16 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2013-01-16 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |