NM SB169 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - [LD 10] Passed House (59-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - [LD 10] Passed House (59-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Soil & Water Conservation District Levies
Title
Soil & Water Conservation District Levies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | [LD 10] Passed House (59-0) Pocket veto by the Governor. |
2018-02-13 | House | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-13 | House | [LD 9] Referred to House Agriculture, Water & Wildlife |
2018-02-13 | House | [LD 9] Referred to House Agriculture, Water & Wildlife |
2018-02-13 | Senate | [LD 18] Passed Senate (37-1) |
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-06 | Senate | [LD 12] Referred to Senate Finance |
2018-02-06 | Senate | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-25 | Senate | [LD 7] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2018-01-25 | Senate | [LD 7] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-01-24 | Senate | [LD 6] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2018-01-24 | Senate | [LD 6] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Finance |