NM SB137 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Distribute Part Of Grt On Svcs To Munis
Title
Distribute Part Of Grt On Svcs To Munis
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | House | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2022-02-17 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2022-02-15 | House | Sent to HTRC - Referrals: HTRC |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:37 N:0 |
2022-02-12 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2022-02-04 | Senate | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2022-01-24 | Senate | SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/STBTC/SFC |