NM SB112 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on February 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Water project fund projects
Title
Water project fund projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Vetoed by the Governor and date. |
2014-02-07 | House | [LD 14] Passed House (54-8) |
2014-02-07 | House | [LD 14] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] Passed Senate (36-2) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] Floor amendment adopted |
2014-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Finance |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Finance |
2014-01-21 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |